THE TANTAM FAMILY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance such charitable purposes as the trustees see fit, in particular, by providing grants. The organisation intends to focus its attention on the advancement and support of the performing arts, including but not limited to music, dance and drama,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Andrew Howard Tantam | Chair | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Olivia Tantam | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £8.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30 | £3.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING GRANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cherry Tree Cottage
Castle Square
Bletchingley
RH1 4LB
- Phone:
- 02074936151
- Email:
- Mahtcorp@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window