HONLEY VILLAGE COMMUNITY TRUST CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust promotes the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment in the village of Honley and the surrounding area. It provides facilities and activities in the interests of social welfare for the recreation and leisure time occupation of the inhabitants of Honley. It provides and maintains Honley Village Hall for the use of inhabitants of Honley.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £6,755 from 8 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kirklees
Governance
- 09 September 2021: CIO registration
- 22 April 2024: Funds received from 1033021 HONLEY VILLAGE COMMUNITY TRUST
- HVCT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET WADSWORTH | Chair | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Brandwood | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Elizabeth Fisher | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Jane Tonge | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Benson | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon White | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Booth | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Needham-Reid | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Phil Hey | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hemming | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Brian Hardy | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.76k | £55.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.36k | £68.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.76k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT ANYWHERE IN THE VILLAGE OF HONLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO HOLD AND MAINTAIN THE MAGDALE FIELDS, HONLEY IN PERPETUITY FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THESE OBJECTS; (2) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF HONLEY, REGARDLESS OF AGE, SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS; (3) TO FURTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS; AND (4) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF KIRKLEES WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
VILLAGE HALL
ROUNDWAY
HONLEY
HOLMFIRTH
HD9 6DE
- Phone:
- 07717766071
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window