VIEW (GLYNNEATH) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to provide learning, advisory and other support services for the benefit of people in the communities of the Neath and Dulais Valleys that can help advance education, relieve financial need, promote health, relieve unemployment, develop capacity and skills, provide or assist in the provision of facilities in the interests of social welfare, for recreation or other leisure.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £74,812 from 6 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Neath Port Talbot
- Powys
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 25 February 1987: Standard registration
- THE GLYNNEATH TRAINING CENTRE (Working name)
- VALLEY INITIATIVE FOR EMPLOYMENT OF WOMEN - VIEW (Previous name)
- VALLEY INITIATIVE FOR EMPLOYMENT OF WOMEN (GLYNNEATH) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Malcolm Scott | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Susan Knoyle | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Brooks | Trustee | 20 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clive Davies | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Matthew Pugh | Trustee | 02 February 2017 |
|
|||||
John Laker | Trustee | 29 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £310.96k | £363.00k | £354.16k | £354.16k | £401.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £312.12k | £336.00k | £349.46k | £349.46k | £346.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £98.61k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £53.38k | £99.35k | £91.75k | £125.72k | £74.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 FEBRUARY 1987 AS AMENDED 16 JULY 2003, 1 JULY 2008 AND 15 JULY 2009.
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION; B) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL NEED; C)TO PROMOTE HEALTH; D) TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT; E) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; F) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NEATH AND DULAIS VALLEYS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Glynneath Training Centre
Oddfellows Street
Glynneath
Neath
SA11 5DB
- Phone:
- 01639721772
- Email:
- info@glynneathtc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window