SYNFONIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Synfonia's mission is two-fold: to help children find a way in to classical music by connecting it with other aspects of their lives, in school and beyond, thereby enabling them to access all the benefits that taking part in music activities can bring; and to provide vocational training, focussing on education work, for young orchestral musicians taking the next steps in their careers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Danielle Frate | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Athanassiadis | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chaz Roger Keiderling | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.40k | £5.82k | £4.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.79k | £7.75k | £3.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 13 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 13 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ARTS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF HIGH-QUALITY CONCERTS AND WORKSHOPS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THOSE IN FULL-TIME EDUCATION. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG MUSICIANS BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND TRAINING WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 BELLE VUE ROAD
LONDON
E17 4DG
- Phone:
- 07909964446
- Email:
- info@synfonia.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window