JEWISH CHILD'S DAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raises funds to distribute to agencies providing services to Jewish children in need of special care in the UK and Israel. Provides equipment of all kinds and supports specific projects for children who are blind, deaf, mentally or physically disabled, orphaned, neglected, deprived, abused, refugee or in need of medical care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,697,904
Donations and legacies | £1.69m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £10.81k |
Total expenditure:
£1,525,099
Raising funds | £86.42k | |
Charitable activities | £1.44m | |
Other | £0 |
£127,708 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £86.42k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.44m | |
Retained for future use | £172.81k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £86.42k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.44m | |
Retained for future use | £300.51k |
People

8 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
Governance
- 09 September 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Spungin | Chair | 25 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Apfel | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Adelman | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eli Haroush | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Benchetrit | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Pelled | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Richard Reinhold | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melvyn ORTON | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £822.07k | £1.70m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.56m | £1.53m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £805.66k | £1.69m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £9.24k | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £7.18k | £10.81k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £94.40k | £640.80k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.48m | £1.44m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £86.09k | £86.42k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £473.70k | £11.52k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.00m | £965.09k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £18.07k | £12.38k | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.10m | £1.23m | |
|
Other assets | £108.30k | £300.77k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £63.54k | £77.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO BENEFIT JEWISH CHILDREN (BEING INDIVIDUALS UNDER THE OF 18) IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, ISRAEL AND ELSEWHERE, AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, IN PARTICULAR TO: 3.1 CONTRIBUTE TO THE WHOLE OR PART OF THE COST OF THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING RELIGIOUS EDUCATION) OF JEWISH CHILDREN; 3.2 PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL EQUIPMENT OF ANY KIND TO EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS WHERE IN THE OPINION OF THE BOARD THE RELEVANT ESTABLISHMENT HAS INSUFFICIENT FUNDS AVAILABLE FROM ITS OWN RESOURCES TO PROVIDE SUCH EQUIPMENT; 3.3 PROVIDE OR FACILITATE THE PROVISION OF APPRENTICESHIPS FOR JEWISH CHILDREN TO SOME USEFUL TRADE OR OCCUPATION; 3.4 ASSIST JEWISH CHILDREN WHO ARE PREPARING FOR, ENTERING UPON OR ENGAGED IN ANY PROFESSION, TRADE, OR OCCUPATION OR SERVICE BY OUTFITS, PAYMENT OF FEES FOR INSTRUCTION, PAYMENT OF TRAVELLING EXPENSES OR SUCH OTHER MEANS FOR THEIR ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OR TO ENABLE THEM TO EARN THEIR OWN LIVING AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT; 3.5 PROMOTE THE HEALTH OF JEWISH CHILDREN BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL, SURGICAL, OR OTHER REMEDIAL ASSISTANCE INCLUDING THE SUPPLY OF SPECTACLES, MEDICINE AND OTHER MEDICAL, SURGICAL OR REMEDIAL APPLIANCES AND EQUIPMENT TO ANY SUCH CHILDREN OR TO HOSPITALS WHICH IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES HAVE INSUFFICIENT FUNDS AVAILABLE FROM THEIR OWN RESOURCES; 3.6 CONTRIBUTE TO THE WHOLE OR PART OF THE COST OF THE MAINTENANCE OF JEWISH CHILDREN IN ANY HOSPITAL, SANATORIUM, CONVALESCENT OR OTHER HOME, OR ANY OTHER INSTITUTION IN WHICH PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANY BODILY OR MENTAL INFIRMITY ARE TAUGHT ANY TRADE OR EMPLOYMENT WHETHER GENERAL OR SPECIAL; 3.7 PROVIDE THE TRAVELLING EXPENSES OF JEWISH CHILDREN TO AND FROM SUCH INSTITUTIONS AS ARE MENTIONED IN CLAUSE 3.6; 3.8 MAINTAIN IN WHOLE OR IN PART JEWISH CHILDREN WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE; 3.9 PROVIDE PROPER CARE AND SUPERVISION INCLUDING ANY NECESSARY TRAVELLING EXPENSES FOR JEWISH CHILDREN TO HAVE A RESPITE BREAK OR HOLIDAY TO IMPROVE THEIR HEALTH, WELFARE AND WELLBEING; 3.10 CONTRIBUTE TO THE WHOLE OR PART OF THE COST OF CONSTRUCTION OF PHYSICAL INFRASTRUCTURE WHERE SUCH INFRASTRUCTURE WILL BE USED FOR THE BENEFIT OF JEWISH CHILDREN IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES; 3.11 PROVIDE FINANCIAL SUPPORT IN AID OF THE EMIGRATION OF JEWISH CHILDREN; AND 3.12 MAKE GRANTS TO OTHER ORGANISATIONS FOR ANY OF THE PURPOSES SET OUT ABOVE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jewish Childs Day
Elscot House
Arcadia Avenue
LONDON
N3 2JU
- Phone:
- 02084468804
- Email:
- info@jcd.uk.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window