Accounts and annual returns ASCOT SHED

Charity number: 1196147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 August 2024 195 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 August 2024 211 days late Download Open in new window