SUNSHINE SUNFLOWER FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunshine Sunflower Foundation help people grow. We provide a safe and secure place of work for disadvantaged young people aged between 16 to 24 years old. We operate around HD8 area of Huddersfield, offering a 12 month paid placement in therapeutic horticulture. Our young people train with horticultural experts who are kind and patient, whilst working towards developing a good work ethic.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 May 2022: CIO registration
- 30 January 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
- 30 January 2025: Funds transferred to 1160003 GROWING WORKS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 12-24 WISHING TO PARTICIPATE IN HORTICULTURE, COUNTRYSIDE AND CONSTRUCTION ACTIVITIES WITH THE VIEW TO: A) HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE ADVANCE IN LIFE BY DEVELOPING SKILLS AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; B) ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION; C) PROMOTING FUTURE EMPLOYMENT; AND D) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE OR DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window