JALALABAD MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC CENTRE (SELLY OAK) BIRMINGHAM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 26 February 1987: Standard registration
- 01 August 2005: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 01 August 2005: Funds transferred to 1105603 JALALABAD TRUST
- ISLAMIC CENTRE (SELLY OAK) BIRMINGHAM (Previous name)
- JALALABAD MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC CENTRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2004 | 07 April 2005 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2004 | 07 April 2005 | 38 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 FEBRUARY 1987 AS AMENDED 26 JUNE 1987, 24 JULY 1987, 7 DECEMBER 1990, 12 APRIL 1992 AND 8 FEBRUARY 2000.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN THE SELLY OAK AREA OF BIRMINGHAM AND ELSEWHERE BY THE PROVISION OF A MOSQUE AND OF THE EDUCATION IN THE PRINCIPLES OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH,AND FOR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ISLAMIC COMMUNITY AND THE TEACHING OF THE MOTHER TONGUES OF THAT COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
THE SELLY OAK AREA OF BIRMINGHAM AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window