NORTH STAFFS ROWING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports the sport of amateur rowing on Rudyard Lake in Staffordshire. The club has both senior and junior sections and is open to all individuals in the local area. Members pay a monthly fee for access to the club's boats which are housed in our boathouse at the lake. The club runs Learn to Row courses for novices. Unfortunately the club cannot offer disability rowing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 10 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Louise Dawes | Trustee | 18 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian David Cook | Trustee | 08 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Webster | Trustee | 08 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christine Caroline Ridden | Trustee | 08 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Richard Taylor | Trustee | 08 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.20k | £48.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.95k | £42.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 August 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 11 August 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE REGION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR AMATEUR ROWING (FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE "FACILITIES" MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT, ACCESS TO COACHING AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES).
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
RUDYARD LAKE ACTIVITIES CENTRE
INFORMATION CENTRE
LAKE ROAD
RUDYARD
LEEK
ST13 8XB
- Phone:
- 07774242526
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window