HENDERSON HALL TALYBONT-ON-USK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of the Henderson Hall facility for all residents of the Talybont on Usk Community Council area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Powys
Governance
- 03 March 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Kirsten Jones | Chair | 08 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Watkins | Trustee | 08 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gail Kinvig | Trustee | 08 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Hemmings | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chris Jones | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rhiannon Beti Davies | Trustee | 30 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne Jeans | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.21k | £43.21k | £36.30k | £38.85k | £43.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.19k | £36.19k | £27.71k | £43.47k | £35.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.24k | £4.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 16 SEPTEMBER 1968 as amended on 25 Jul 2018 as amended on 25 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF LLANFEIGAN AND LLANDETTY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF LLANFEIGAN AND LLANDETTY
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Penpentre
Talybont-on-Usk
Nr Brecon Powys
Powys
LD3 7YQ
- Phone:
- 07986436317
- Email:
- hendersonhallchair@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window