LIVING PRAISE CHAPEL WORLDWIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a church - we exist to propagate the gospel of Jesus Christ for the benefit of the community, nationally and internationally; we do so by holding church services regularly, we also hold programs as arranged where the communities near and far are invited. We provide physical and spiritual support to those who want it by asking at the church or calling the church number.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 September 2021: CIO registration
- LPCW MINISTRIES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frank Amankwah | Chair | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kayden Ceon Kwabena Kwarteng | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nasia Lois Akua Kwarteng | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/06/2022 | 01/06/2023 | 01/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.24k | £15.03k | £16.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.47k | £13.17k | £17.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 June 2024 | 02 April 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2024 | 02 April 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 June 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 June 2022 | 21 May 2023 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2022 | 21 May 2023 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THE COMMUNITY IN ENGLAND AND WALES BY: 1) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN THE WIDER COMMUNITY 3) THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND SIGNPOSTING TO LOCAL AGENCIES OF THOSE WHO ARE SICK OR SUFFERING FROM POOR HEALTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Drill Hall
17 Amwell End
WARE
Hertfordshire
SG11 9HP
- Phone:
- 07982429297
- Email:
- Prophetlarry07@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window