LOLA'S HOMELESS LADDER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, the relief and assistance of people in The London Borough of Newham and adjacent boroughs who are in need by reason of homelessness or being at risk of homelessness, including through insecure accommodation, and those who are in need due to financial hardship, in particular but not exclusively by providing items, services and advice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
- Hackney
- Newham
- Redbridge
- Tower Hamlets
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 20 September 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HIMANSHU JAIN | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Stella Jane Wybron | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Maureen Elizabeth Wood | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.98k | £36.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £14.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 29 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 29 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 13 December 2024 | 351 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 13 December 2024 | 351 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF NEWHAM AND ADJACENT BOROUGHS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF HOMELESSNESS OR BEING AT RISK OF HOMELESSNESS, INCLUDING THROUGH INSECURE ACCOMMODATION, AND THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED DUE TO FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING ITEMS, SERVICES AND ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5th Floor
14-16 Dowgate Hill
London
EC4R 2SU
- Phone:
- 07950355241
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window