BUSHY LEAZE FAMILY SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Family Support Team address the lack of provisions for families with children under 5 in Alton and East Hampshire in crisis situations, or in need of support to improve their child's quality of life and life chances. We do this through outreach work, targeted groups and one-to-one support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 31 August 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dawn Patricia Murphy | Chair | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Suzanna Rustell | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Derek Edward Gardner | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Snook | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Anne Temple | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Bryan Read | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £179.49k | £72.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £117.62k | £117.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.00k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF VULNERABLE CHILDREN FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN HAMPSHIRE, PRIMARILY THOSE AGED UNDER 5, BY: A) FACILITATING SUPPORT FOR GOOD QUALITY PLAY, LEARNING AND CHILD CARE EXPERIENCES FOR CHILDREN BOTH AT HOME AND TOGETHER WITH OTHER CHILDREN IN GROUP ACTIVITIES; B) PROVIDING TARGETED SUPPORT FOR PARENTS AND CARERS, BOTH AT HOME AND IN GROUPS, FOCUSSING ON ATTACHMENT, PARENTING SKILLS, EMOTIONAL HEALTH AND WELL-BEING, ACCESSING CHILDCARE AND DEVELOPING SOCIAL NETWORKS; C) FACILITATING ONE TO ONE ADVICE AND GROUP SUPPORT TO FAMILIES IN PARTNERSHIP WITH HEALTH, SOCIAL CARE AND OTHER COMMUNITY PARTNERS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BUSHY LEAZE FAMILY SUPPORT
BUSHY LEAZE CHILDREN AND FAMILIES C
EASTBROOKE ROAD
ALTON
HAMPSHIRE
GU34 2DR
- Phone:
- 01420 87675
- Email:
- BLCOMMUNITYFUND@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window