ROCK PARK ESTATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain the Sea Wall and Esplanade as a common and public walk for the benefit and recreation of the inhabitants of Rock Ferry and of the neighbourhood and for visitors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wirral
Governance
- 13 April 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROCK PARK ESTATE COMPANY LIMITED | Trustee | 12 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119 | £45 | £241 | £409 | £811 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £284 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RELEASE DATED 23RD JULY 1836 AND ARTICLES OF AGREEMENT DATED 21 FEBRUARY 1837.
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN THE SEA WALL AND ESPLANADE AS A COMMON AND PUBLIC WALK FOR THE BENEFIT AND RECREATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF ROCK FERRY AND OF THE NEIGHBOURHOOD AND FOR VISITORS.
Area of benefit
ROCK FERRY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Rock Park
BIRKENHEAD
CH42 1PJ
- Phone:
- 01516451088
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window