EXERCISE REHABILITATION ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The rehabilitation of people diagnosed with cardiac disease and associated conditions. The promotion of the prevention of heart disease, in particular by exercise.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £242,153 from 4 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 10 March 1987: Standard registration
- ACTION HEART (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER OWEN | Trustee | 23 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Richard Jonathan Ennis | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr LESLEY DORIAN DUGMORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUSSELL JAMES TIPSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £562.70k | £606.12k | £415.36k | £427.52k | £449.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £587.13k | £521.68k | £513.07k | £492.44k | £513.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £279.20k | £268.43k | £233.18k | £292.68k | £242.15k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £224.84k | £61.08k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £152.47k | £60.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £19.10k | £625 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £279.20k | £286.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £111.93k | £32.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £224.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £40.00k | £21.01k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £587.13k | £521.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.05k | £3.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 JULY 1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED THE 27 FEBRUARY 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 27 SEPTEMBER 2005 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ARE:- (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CARE OF CARDIAC DISEASE PATIENTS IN PARTICULAR BY THE REHABILITATION EXERCISE PROGRAMME CURRENTLY BEING HELD AT THE RUSSELLS HALL HOSPITAL, DUDLEY, WEST MIDLANDS. (2) THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, PREMISES, AND MONIES TO ASSIST HOSPITALS IN THE DUDLEY AREA AND ELSEWHERE IN THE REHABILITATION OF CARDIAC DISEASE PATIENTS. (3) THE PROMOTION AND ASSISTANCE OF RESEARCH INTO CARDIO- RESPIRATORY DISEASES, AND THE TREATMENT THEREOF IN PARTICULAR BY EXERCISE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS PLEASE SEE CLAUSE 3(A) 4 TO 6 OF AMENDING RESOLUTION).
Area of benefit
THE DUDLEY AREA THE WEST MIDLANDS AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 BAIRD HOUSE
DUDLEY INNOVATION CENTRE
SECOND AVENUE
PENSNETT TRADING ESTATE
KINGSWINFORD
WEST MID
- Phone:
- 01384292233
- Email:
- russtipson@actionheart.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window