HYTHE LAWN TENNIS CLUB

Charity number: 1196979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation in particular by the provision of facilities for the playing of tennis.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £142,000
Total expenditure: £155,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 December 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Hounsell Trustee 28 April 2025
None on record
Hilary Casey Trustee 27 April 2021
None on record
Andrew Mcleish Trustee 27 April 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £57.67k £142.00k
Total expenditure £40.91k £155.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HYTHE TENNIS CLUB
THE GROVE
HYTHE
KENT
CT21 6AX
Phone:
07895 731585