WHITLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 518590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote the benefit of inhabitants of Whitley and the neighbourhood without distinction of sex, political, religious or other opinions, by associating local authorities, voluntary organisations and inhabitants in a common effort to provide facilities of social welfare for recreation and leisure-time occupation with the objects of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants,

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £134,026
Total expenditure: £149,025

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kirklees

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 March 1987: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER DEWAR ANGUS Chair
None on record
Eleanor Hobson Trustee 13 March 2024
None on record
Stewart John Abel Trustee 10 May 2022
None on record
Claire Voyce Trustee 21 October 2021
None on record
Margaret Drury Trustee 21 October 2021
None on record
Clare Torr Trustee 21 October 2021
None on record
Angela Hutton Trustee 21 October 2021
None on record
Sarah Marsden Trustee 21 October 2021
None on record
Catherine Woodward Trustee 21 October 2021
None on record
Marjorie Wheelhouse Trustee 21 October 2021
WALKER AND GREENWOOD EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Anthony Smyth Trustee 21 October 2021
None on record
AUDREY ELIZABETH WRAITHMELL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.72k £12.85k £14.19k £43.62k £134.03k
Total expenditure £16.60k £13.99k £3.80k £29.56k £149.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.50k £7.20k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 14 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 15 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Community Centre
Howroyd Lane
Whitley
DEWSBURY
West Yorkshire
WF12 0NB
Phone:
07717 876017
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available