FOOTBALL WITHOUT BORDERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TBC
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Cameroon
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Congo
- Equatorial Guinea
- Gabon
- Nigeria
Governance
- 08 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL JAMES SYMONS | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
SIMA KATIE DAVARIAN-DEHSORKHE | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Nov 2021 as amended on 26 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN EASTERN EUROPE, CENTRAL AND WEST AFRICA IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROMOTION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF FOOTBALL (“FACILITIES” MEANING EQUIPMENT, THE PROVISION OF RELATED TRAINING AND ORGANISED FOOTBALL ACTIVITIES).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 5, The Loft
VAUXHALL QUAY, SUTTON HARBOUR
PLYMOUTH
PL4 0DN
- Phone:
- 07813937026
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window