THE BLACKMORE VALE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention or relief of poverty in Sturminster Newton and the surrounding areas by the operation of a community store for food and essential items and the provision of linked support, services, education and advice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £38,630 from 6 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 27 October 2021: CIO registration
- The Vale Family Hub (Working name)
- THE VALE PANTRY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Celia Wright | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Rawe | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Powell | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Smith | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr William Duncan Ward | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carole Jones | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £367.88k | £394.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £212.64k | £288.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £32.25k | £38.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN STURMINSTER NEWTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE OPERATION OF A COMMUNITY STORE FOR FOOD AND ESSENTIAL ITEMS AND THE PROVISION OF LINKED SUPPORT, SERVICES, EDUCATION AND ADVICE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 22B
Butts Pond Industrial Estate
STURMINSTER NEWTON
Dorset
DT10 1AZ
- Phone:
- 01258 920040
- Email:
- carole@valefamilyhub.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window