Financial history PETS' LIFELINE - CUMBRIA

Charity Number: 518593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £45.49k £34.57k £26.67k £47.54k £63.88k
Total expenditure £26.23k £30.80k £26.29k £47.71k £91.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A