THE GREIG HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintains and manages The Greig Hall as a community centre and arts venue for the benefit of the residents of Alcester and surrounding parishes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 25 August 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Donald Matheson | Chair | 21 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Joy Mills | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Donald Blizzard | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Lewington | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glen Atkinson | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Rastall | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Mark Foster | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Raymond Jones | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ALEXANDER | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Julie Anne Smith | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.50k | £103.25k | £118.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.41k | £55.88k | £85.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.10k | £425 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 25 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY HALL FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ALCESTER AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A)MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B)OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE GREIG HALL
KINWARTON ROAD
ALCESTER
B49 6AD
- Phone:
- 07598756926
- Email:
- office@greighall.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window