Trustees THE GREIG HALL
Charity number: 1195635

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Donald Matheson | Chair | 21 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Joy Mills | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Donald Blizzard | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Lewington | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glen Atkinson | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Rastall | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Mark Foster | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Raymond Jones | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ALEXANDER | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Julie Anne Smith | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.