STEEL CITY CHORISTERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Steel City Choristers is an exciting and innovative choir of children and adults that is rooted in the English choral tradition. We offer our choristers a free first-class musical education and serve a wide range of communities in and around Sheffield through a diverse programme of choral concerts, services and projects. We believe in the power of music to change lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 23 September 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Caroe | Chair | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gill O'Connell | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Holman | Trustee | 15 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jeremy Dawson | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Chris Caroe | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.44k | £57.48k | £64.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.93k | £34.27k | £41.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.94k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY THOSE LIVING IN OR EDUCATED IN SHEFFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN THE SUBJECT OF MUSIC AND IN PARTICULAR CHORAL MUSIC, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY A) CREATING OPPORTUNITIES FOR CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS TO SING ALONGSIDE EACH OTHER TO THE HIGHEST MUSICAL STANDARDS; AND B) PROMOTING AND DELIVERING MUSICAL AND CHORAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, REGARDLESS OF THEIR SOCIO-ECONOMIC OR ETHNIC BACKGROUND AND IRRESPECTIVE OF THEIR PRIOR EXPERIENCE. 2. TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC AND IN PARTICULAR CHORAL MUSIC AND RELATED ACTIVITIES IN ALL THEIR ASPECTS PARTICULARLY IN SHEFFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PRESENTING PUBLIC PERFORMANCES AND PRODUCING DIGITAL CONTENT, PARTICULARLY FOR COMMUNITIES THAT WOULD NOT OTHERWISE HAVE ACCESS TO CHORAL MUSIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 THE GROVE
SHEFFIELD
S174AS
- Phone:
- 07790869278
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window