FELLOWSHIP WITHOUT WALLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fellowship Without Walls provides the following services/activities: * religious worship services, both in person and online; * weekly Bible and prayer group meetings; * weekly gatherings including meals; and * production and distribution of sermons, worship services, leaflets and by other means.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 29 September 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Keast | Chair | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MARIA WHITHAM | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Anne Keast | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Margaret Evans | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Frederick Paul Doble | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.77k | £8.16k | £13.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.30k | £7.57k | £13.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN CAMBORNE, CORNWALL AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 BASSET ROAD
CAMBORNE
TR14 8SH
- Phone:
- 01209714027
- Email:
- anthony.keast1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window