THE EQUIANO PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Equiano Project is a debate, discussion and ideas forum. We facilitate conversations about and promote the values of freedom, common humanity and universalism, by hosting public events, publishing reports and articles, and creating video and podcast content.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 March 2022: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oliver Langton Wright | Chair | 31 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Katharine Moana Birbalsingh CBE | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Inaya Folarin Iman | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marie Kawthar Daouda LLA | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2022 | 01/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £12.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £6.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE CIO HAS THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS: (1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (BUT PARTICULARLY PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 21) ON THE SUBJECTS OF TOLERANCE, UNIVERSALISM, FREEDOM OF EXPRESSION AND CITIZENSHIP IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: (A) DELIVERING LESSONS, WORKSHOPS AND CLUBS FOR SCHOOLS AND ORGANISATIONS; (B) DEVELOPING AND MAKING AVAILABLE INFORMATION, MATERIALS AND RESOURCES TO THE PUBLIC; AND (C) HOSTING EVENTS, TALKS AND DISCUSSIONS; AND (2) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGION, FOR EXAMPLE BY DELIVERING TRAINING AND ADVISORY SERVICES TO ORGANISATIONS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY, FOR EXAMPLE BY PUBLISHING REPORTS, REVIEWS AND ARTICLES; (C) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; AND (D) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008 (AS APPLICABLE).
Contact information
- Address:
-
87-90 Paul Street
London
EC2A 4NE
- Phone:
- 02034755329
- Email:
- hello@theequianoproject.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window