BURY VETERANS HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Here at Bury Vetrerans Hub we signpost and offer support in the following area's:- Counselling, Family Support, Housing Support, Combatting Isolation, Debt Advice, Education, Health and Well Being Support, Community Gardening and Bee Keeping. We also offer sport and social activities and events requested by our members. This also includes two Breakfast Clubs and two monthly drop ins.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,852 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bury
Governance
- 09 March 2022: CIO registration
- BURY VETERANS HUB CAFE CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shiley Anita Simmons | Chair | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gail Slack | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ANDREWS | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY ANITA SIMMONS | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELEANOR REDFERN | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.02k | £10.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.59k | £22.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £1.85k | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.53k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 April 2025 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 April 2025 | 75 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 September 2024 | 243 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 September 2024 | 243 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF VETERANS OF ALL BRANCHES OF THE ARMED FORCES AND THEIR FAMILIES LIVING IN BURY BY: 1. THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG VETERANS TO PREVENT THEM FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND TO HELP THEM INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. 2. THE RELIEF OF THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL SICKNESS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, HEALTH AND WELLBEING SUPPORT. 3. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF HOUSING SUPPORT AND DEBT ADVICE. 4. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND COURSES TO ENHANCE JOB AND TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 7
Bury Business Centre
Kay Street
BURY
Lancashire
BL9 6BU
- Phone:
- 07488395473
- Email:
- Buryveteranshub@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window