BUCKHURST HILL BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purposes of the Church are: the advancement of the Christian faith as a Baptist Church and in accordance with the Basis of Faith primarily but not exclusively within Buckhurst Hill, Essex and the surrounding neighbourhood; such other charitable purposes as shall, in the opinion of the charity trustees, put into practice the Christian faith in accordance with its Basis of Faith.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 31 October 2023: CIO registration
- 25 February 2025: Funds received from 1129670 BUCKHURST HILL BAPTIST CHURCH
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Kevin Clark | Chair | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Needham | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graeme William Perry | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony King | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Colin Richard Tompson | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ann Hunter | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 31 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
3.1. THE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE: 3.1.1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS A BAPTIST CHURCH AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN BUCKHURST HILL, ESSEX AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; 3.1.2. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES, PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; PROVIDED THAT THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH PURPOSES MUST BE UNDERTAKEN IN A MANNER THAT IS CONSISTENT WITH THE DOCTRINAL DISTINCTIVES AND ETHICAL STATEMENTS AS MAY BE ADOPTED AND AMENDED BY THE CHURCH FROM TIME TO TIME IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THE CHURCH HANDBOOK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Buckhurst Hill Baptist Church
28 Palmerston Road
BUCKHURST HILL
Essex
IG9 5LW
- Phone:
- 02085590222
- Email:
- churchofficebhbc@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.