1876 (KINGSBRIDGE & DISTRICT) SQUADRON AIR TRAINING CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a youth organisation based in Kingsbridge who are affiliated to the wider RAF Air Cadets which focuses on: - promoting and encouraging among young people a practical interest in aviation and the Royal Air Force. - providing training which will be useful in the Services and civilian life. - fostering the spirit of adventure and developing qualities of leadership and good citizenship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 31 August 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Lemar | Trustee | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Samantha English | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.72k | £5.06k | £6.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.47k | £5.41k | £6.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 February 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JUL 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: - TO SUPPORT THE CHARITY'S SQUADRON COMMANDER TO FURTHER THE OBJECTS OF THE AIR TRAINING CORPS (THE ATC) AS CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE TO THE ROYAL WARRANT AND AS AMENDED FROM TIME TO TIME BUT IN PARTICULAR TO SUPPORT ACTIVITIES WHICH FOSTER THE SPIRIT OF ADVENTURE AMONGST THE SQUADRON'S CADETS AND DEVELOP THEIR QUALITIES OF LEADERSHIP AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP - TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE ATC'S CADETS IN THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND SERVICE TO THE COMMUNITY, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES AND ASSIST THEM TO GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. - TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE ATC'S CADETS BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Air Cadet Hut
Wallingford Road
Kingsbridge
Devon
TQ7 1NF
- Phone:
- 01548853930
- Email:
- 1876@rafac.mod.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window