Andover Men's Shed

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the shed is for the benefit of the members (men mainly) in the local communities. provide a repair shop and help other local charities, building projects for our families and the local communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
31 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 January 2022: CIO registration
- ANDOVER MEN'S SHED ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Alan Barr | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Keith Loader | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Howcroft | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Cooke | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.00k | £8.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.76k | £3.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 31 August 2024 | 212 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 31 August 2024 | 212 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 Jan 2022 as amended on 15 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE (PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OLDER MEN) WITHIN THE ANDOVER AND SURROUNDING AREA FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED. RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN WHICH THEY CAN MEET JOINTLY OR INDIVIDUALLY TO UNDERTAKE CREATIVE, PHYSICAL OR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES. LEARN OR PASS ON SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE AND TO SUPPORT EACH OTHER SOCIALLY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY OR PARTS OF SOCIETY AS A RESULT OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS, UNEMPLOYMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, YOUTH OR OLD AGE, ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL).
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 9 Chantry Centre
Andover
Hampshire
SP10 1LX
- Phone:
- 07776216516
- Email:
- BRIAN.COOKE75@OUTLOOK.COM
- Website:
-
andovermensshed.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window