Trustees Worcestershire Cricket Foundation
Charity Number: 1197703

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harriet Clare Saunders | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jerry Husbands | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Slevin | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Willem Joseph Harris | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jon Simon Edward Landau | Trustee | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Madeleine Heywood | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Catherine Glarvey | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Phoebe Dawson | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.