UK WELCOMES REFUGEES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UK Welcomes Refugees has established the charity alongside refugee organisations accompanying displaced and resettled refugees within our communities who are in need of support and integration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 September 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Anthony Wiggin | Chair | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Molly Chitokwindo | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Anthony Brown | Trustee | 02 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Rabbi Daniel Jonathan Rich JP BA Dip | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £197.60k | £156.00k | £145.00k | £225.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.56k | £135.23k | £95.95k | £208.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 JUN 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 SEP 2021
Charitable objects
1. TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SUCH A WAY THAT SUCH MEMBERS ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; 2. TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING CHARITIES BY GROWING, EMBEDDING GOOD PRACTICE IN AND SUPPORTING SUCH ORGANISATIONS; 3. THE PROMOTION OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; THE “VOLUNTARY SECTOR” MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS. CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. 4. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AMONG PERSONS WHO ARE INTERNALLY DISPLACED OR IN MIGRATION OR WHO ARE ASYLUM SEEKERS OR REFUGEES FLEEING SITUATIONS INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) WAR, PERSECUTION, AND CLIMATE CHANGE; 5. TO FURTHER SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
85 Waddington Road
CLITHEROE
BB7 2HN
- Phone:
- 01200427396
- Email:
- info@ukwelcomesrefugees.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window