GOD LIFE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the christian religion in accordance with the beliefs and practices of God Life Church, and to promote and assist the charitable work and purposes of the Church in the community .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 October 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victor Maxwell | Chair | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
BRYAN BEVERLEY | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
IFEOMA EHIZOJIE | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Idira Maxwell PHD | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.34k | £10.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.37k | £10.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF BROADCASTING CHRISTIAN MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE, CONTRIBUTING TO THE SPIRITUAL AND MORAL EDUCATION OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF CHRISTIAN RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. BEING OPEN TO AND ENGAGING WITH SOCIETY AS A WHOLE AND OFFERING SUPPORT FOR THOSE NEEDING HELP SUCH AS VISITING PEOPLE WHO ARE DISTRESSED, SICK OR DYING, OR PROVIDING FOOD AND SHELTER TO THE HOMELESS AS ARE FUNDAMENTAL TO THE PRACTICAL DELIVERY OF THE BENEFITS OF CHRISTIANITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Hedgerow Lane
NORTHAMPTON
NN3 9GH
- Phone:
- 07423142531
- Email:
- contact@godlifechurch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window