PUMPKIN'S WILDLIFE HOSPITAL AND REHABILITATION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1) The advancement of animal welfare through the provision of veterinary and rehabilitative care for sick, injured and orphaned wildlife for release back into its natural habitat where possible; and (2) The advancement of education of the public, specifically concerning the welfare and conservation of British wildlife species.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 November 2021: CIO registration
- 19 May 2025: Funds received from 1192300 CW WILDLIFE RESCUE
- PUMPKIN PATCH WILDLIFE RESCUE AND REHABILITATION CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ana Lapaz-Mendez | Chair | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Minesh Pareek | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsti Hummel | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Arnold | Trustee | 05 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Mary Marks | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Francis Smart | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ramzy Nabil Bamieh | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Marina Klein | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £333 | £61.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £42.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 November 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 November 2024 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Nov 2021 as amended on 08 Mar 2022 as amended on 19 Apr 2022 as amended on 02 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF VETERINARY AND REHABILITATIVE CARE FOR SICK, INJURED AND ORPHANED WILDLIFE FOR RELEASE BACK INTO ITS NATURAL HABITAT WHERE POSSIBLE; AND (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, SPECIFICALLY CONCERNING THE WELFARE AND CONSERVATION OF BRITISH WILDLIFE SPECIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stockers Farm
Stockers Farm Road
RICKMANSWORTH
Hertfordshire
WD3 1NZ
- Phone:
- 07738369394
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window