CHURCHES UNITED FELLOWSHIP -UK (CUF-UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our organization advances the Christian faith according to the Statement of faith. We believe in the triune God of the Bible. A man must be born again to enter the kingdom of God. The organization targets Tamil speaking population, and our prayers are Partly in Tamil and English. We aim to raise awareness and understand religious beliefs and practices among a network of pastors and associates.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BISHOP WINSTON REGINALD CHANDRAKUMAR | Chair | 18 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev JOSEPH CHINNAIYAN | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR KANAGAIYAH ARULANANDARASA | Trustee | 18 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
BISHOP CORBAN THIAPHILUS PREMKUMAR STEPHEN | Trustee | 18 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev JEBAKUMAR GNANIAH | Trustee | 18 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Vasanthakumar Michael Solomon | Trustee | 18 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev ANTONYPILLAI WIJENDRAN CAESAR | Trustee | 18 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr JESURATNAM MOHANDAS CHRISTY | Trustee | 18 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.06k | £24.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.80k | £30.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH THROUGH THE CREATION OF FORUMS FOR UNITED KINGDOM PASTORS AND ASSOCIATE PASTORS -TO COME TOGETHER IN UNITY FOR FELLOWSHIP, TO SHARE AND TO JOIN IN PRAYERS IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CIO FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. -TO RAISE AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING AMONG THE NETWORK OF PASTORS AND ASSOCIATE PASTORS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM TO RESOLVE THEIR PERSONAL AND CHURCH ISSUES. -TO ORGANISE EVENTS SUCH AS CONFERENCE SEMINARS AND CRUSADE GATHERINGS ON A NATIONAL AND REGIONAL LEVEL TO ACHIEVE THE OBJECTIVES. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CIO FROM TIME-TO-TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
188A GLOUCESTER ROAD
CROYDON
CR0 2DJ
- Phone:
- 07904989911
- Email:
- cuf-uk@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window