PALACE DRUM CLINIC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement and appreciation and education in the art of music for the public benefit in the West Midlands and surrounding areas through the provision of drumming and musical recreation facilities, events, workshops, concerts, recitals, demonstrations and lessons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2023
Total income includes £4,847 from 1 government contract(s) and £4,847 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Garry Allcock | Chair | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Benson | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Sidaway | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Skinner | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2022 | 30/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.69k | £12.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.75k | £20.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £4.85k | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.84k | £4.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | 06 September 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT AND APPRECIATION AND EDUCATION IN THE ART OF MUSIC FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE WEST MIDLANDS AND SURROUNDING AREAS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF DRUMMING AND MUSICAL RECREATION FACILITIES, EVENTS, WORKSHOPS, CONCERTS, RECITALS, DEMONSTRATIONS AND LESSONS.
Area of benefit
IN THE WEST MIDLANDS AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
56a EVESHAM WALK
KINGFISHER SHOPPING CENTRE
REDDITCH
B97 4ET
- Phone:
- 07973840635
- Email:
- info@palacedrumclinic.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window