ACCRA ACADEMY ALUMNI UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising activities for the benefit of pupils of Accra Academy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Ghana
Governance
- 11 February 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Meyer | Chair | 25 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ransford Bampoe-Addo | Trustee | 25 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Raphael Aryaa Tettey | Trustee | 25 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Osafo Omane | Trustee | 25 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Yoofi Halm | Trustee | 25 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Francis Kofi Owoo | Trustee | 25 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
FRANCIS ANNAN | Trustee | 25 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £267 | £294 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.45k | £3.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 AUG 2016 AS AMENDED ON 04 FEB 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING ACCRA ACADEMY (ACCRA, GHANA) BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING WITH THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND AMENITIES FOR EDUCATION OF THE STUDENTS TO ENHANCE THEIR LEARNING AND WELLBEING. TO SERVE AS AN OUTLET FOR THE PROVISION OF GUIDANCE AND ASSISTANCE AND BY ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL, AND OTHER ACTIVITIES TO THE YOUTH WITHIN THE LOCALITY OF THE SCHOOL AS A MEANS OF: (I) ADVANCING AND DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES, AND CAPABILITIES TO MAKE THEM INDEPENDENT, MATURE, AND RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. (II) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 WHIPPENDELL WAY
ORPINGTON
Kent
BR5 3DF
- Phone:
- 07984316692
- Email:
- randyaddo@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window