THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH HEELEY WITH ARBOURTHORNE AND NORFOLK PARK

Charity number: 1196414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Christian religious activities provided for all who wish to participate.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £97,517
Total expenditure: £94,815

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 November 2021: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHRIST CHURCH HEELEY PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Amy Hole Trustee 10 September 2024
THE WILKINSON MEMORIAL FUND OF HEELEY PARISH CHURCH
Received: On time
Cynthia Sutherland Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Laura Passo Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Louise Bettridge Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Lakpa Tamang Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Amelia Reeves Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Opeoluwa Akinoso Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Richard Anthony Patterson Trustee 27 March 2022
None on record
Simon Bell Trustee 27 March 2022
THE WILKINSON MEMORIAL FUND OF HEELEY PARISH CHURCH
Received: On time
Kenneth Law Trustee 27 March 2022
None on record
Stephen Rastall Trustee 27 March 2022
None on record
Andrew Laurie Trustee 27 March 2022
None on record
Richard Carl Thompson Trustee 30 May 2021
None on record
Joanne Louise McCarthy Trustee 30 May 2021
None on record
Stephen Adams Trustee 30 May 2021
ST LEONARD'S COMMUNITY CHURCH
Received: On time
THE WILKINSON MEMORIAL FUND OF HEELEY PARISH CHURCH
Received: On time
ST PAUL & ST LEONARD'S CHURCH
Received: On time
SUSAN LAW Trustee 27 September 2020
ST PAUL & ST LEONARD'S CHURCH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £131.64k £97.52k
Total expenditure £112.60k £94.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CHRIST CHURCH
151 GLEADLESS ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S2 3AE
Phone:
01142557718