CARSINGTON SAILABILITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides support for the operation of Sailability by the Sailability section of Carsington Sailability Club. Carsington Sailability's aim is to enable people with physical and/or mental disabilities to try sailing and take part regularly. The charity owns and maintains boats and equipment such as buoyancy aids and hoists which it loans to the sailing club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 06 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Mollart | Chair | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Douglas Stubbs | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Alan Ironmonger | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Frank Greenwood Nicholson | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Margaret Chamberlain | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Loiuse Spencer | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Jillings | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard David Hucker | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.92k | £15.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.96k | £4.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Dec 2021 as amended on 24 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF WATER-BASED ACTIVITIES AT CARSINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES AND MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF THEIR LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CARSINGTON SAILING CLUB LTD
CARSINGTON WATER
ASHBOURNE
DE6 1SU
- Phone:
- 01629540609
- Email:
- info@carsingtonsc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window