INCOMMON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
InCommon's activities bring together people of different ages. We directly deliver intergenerational programmes in Greater London with young people (age 5-15) and older people usually living in retirement housing. We also support other organisations and individuals to run intergenerational projects in England through advice, resource sharing and an online platform.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 June 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harmony Chiu Yeu Chan | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Gordon | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosalia Anna Delfino | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth McDonald | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hector Smethurst | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £326.25k | £437.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £238.95k | £325.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 MAY 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 JUN 2022
Charitable objects
2.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 2.1.1 THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION PARTICULARLY, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, AMONG OLDER PEOPLE, WHO ARE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY INCLUDING BY A) DEVELOPING AND FACILITATING SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL INTERGENERATIONAL ACTIVITIES; B) ENCOURAGING PEOPLE TO SUPPORT AND TAKE PART IN SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL INTERGENERATIONAL ACTIVITIES AIMED AT PREVENTING AND RELIEVING LONELINESS AMONG SOCIALLY EXCLUDED PEOPLE AND FACILITATING PEOPLE TO CONTRIBUTE TO THEIR COMMUNITY; IN THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF OLD AGE, DISABILITY, ILL-HEALTH OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE AND ‘SOCIAL INCLUSION’ MEANS THE CONDITION OF NOT BEING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED. 2.1.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION INCLUDING BY DEVELOPING, FACILITATING AND PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AIMED AT PROMOTING INTERGENERATIONAL UNDERSTANDING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
South Dock
Office 5
Tobacco Dock
Tobacco Quay
Wapping Lane
- Phone:
- 07379050176
- Email:
- Hello@incommon.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window