STAMFORD AND DISTRICT LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity Number: 1196478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raise money/awareness in Stamford and surrounding area; make donations locally to worthy causes and people, do hands on work on small scale projects to assist people in need; hold 3 main events each year, Rock on the Rec in July, Christmas Tree Festival and Santa's Grotto in November/December. Run a talking newspaper service reading and distributing local paper on memory stick to visually impaired

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £8,373
Total expenditure: £6,716

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 November 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GILLIAN SARAH CLARKE Chair 04 March 2020
STAMFORD AND DISTRICT LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Roberta Jane Amaral Trustee 04 March 2020
STAMFORD AND DISTRICT LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Lynn Faulkner Trustee 04 March 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £4.25k £5.54k £8.37k
Total expenditure £5.39k £7.38k £6.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £444 £700

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 08 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 08 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 20 June 2024 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 20 June 2024 51 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 15 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 15 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 Clare Court
ST. IVES
PE27 6DE
Phone:
01480354011