CENTRAL BAPTIST CHURCH CHELMSFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The church's mission statement is to "Love God, Love Others, Make Disciples". It seeks to achieve this through our morning services which are contemporary and engaging, with lively band-led worship, clear biblical teaching, and an informal family feel. We also enjoy good working and community relationships with other churches and various outreach ministries in the city.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 05 November 2021: CIO registration
- 05 September 2022: Funds received from 1128728 CENTRAL BAPTIST CHURCH CHELMSFORD
- CENTRAL BAPTIST CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Charles Seago | Chair | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mithal Law | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Jeanette Bellworthy | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Grant Camden Hopkins | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Elizabeth Hogg | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Holman | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Anang | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Jane Seago | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Philip Marsden | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER RITCHIE | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Parrotte | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £232.00k | £371.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.00k | £263.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE: 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. 3.1.2 THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CENTRAL BAPTIST CHURCH
VICTORIA ROAD SOUTH
CHELMSFORD
CM1 1LN
- Phone:
- 01245264163
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window