READING HOSPITAL BROADCASTING SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A hospital broadcasting service ("Hospital Radio Reading") for the Royal Berkshire Hospital. Patients are visited in their wards and can phone in free from the bedside to take part in programmes. A live and interactive service of record requests, football commentaries & other entertainment (45 hours per week) is augmented by a non-stop automated service of music, news & information at other times.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
41 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Reading
Governance
- 03 November 2021: CIO registration
- 29 April 2022: Funds received from 244974 READING HOSPITAL BROADCASTING SERVICE
- HOSPITAL RADIO READING OR HRR (PRONOUNCED "H DOUBLE R") (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerard Bernard Kevin ROCKS MA Oxon | Chair | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Richard Precious | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Michael Wilson | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Monahan | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Margaret McKechnie | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin O'Czaja | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Marshall BURTON STEWART | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANN BEASLEY | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.07k | £6.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.18k | £4.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, POOR HEALTH AND OLD AGE AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING IN READING AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING A LOCAL BROADCASTING SERVICE FOR HOSPITALS, RESIDENTIAL HOMES AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS, AND FOR PATIENTS RECEIVING COMMUNITY CARE, (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF SICKNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF THE BENEFITS OF LIVING A HEALTHY LIFESTYLE, AND THE IMPORTANCE OF MAINTAINING GOOD PERSONAL MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH BY (MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) THE MEANS OF BROADCASTING HEALTH EDUCATION MESSAGES TO PEOPLE LIVING IN READING AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 MALDON CLOSE
READING
RG30 2DH
- Phone:
- 0118 322 8508
- Email:
- info@hrreading.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window