Accounts and annual returns THE HIGH WRAY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1195928
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 February 2024 23 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 February 2024 11 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 25 February 2023 13 March 2024 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 February 2023 13 March 2024 79 days late Download Open in new window