CLARENDON COLLEGE PAST STUDENT ASSOCIATION-UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising acitivities such as annual bbq, annual dinner and dance, annual raffle to raise funds to support the charity projects eg academic scholarships for our alma mater.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 May 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Webley Leroy | Chair | 03 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ella Morgan | Trustee | 03 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Menzes | Trustee | 03 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Danette Gayle | Trustee | 03 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karlene Spence | Trustee | 03 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leaford Dixon | Trustee | 03 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Dean | Trustee | 03 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 29 March 2025 | 242 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING CLARENDON COLLEGE BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS AND ITEMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
75 ARNGASK ROAD
CATFORD
LONDON
SE6 1XZ
- Phone:
- 07957619199
- Email:
- ccpsauk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window