Governing document STOCKTON-ON-TEES U3A

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/10/1986 AS AMENDED ON 03/03/1998 AS AMENDED ON 05/03/2002 AS AMENDED ON 13/01/2014 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 08 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
STOCKTON-ON-TEES AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.