TEDDINGTON BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Church advances religion through holding regular Church services which include Christian preaching and worship for the local community. The Church also advances the religion by holding regular Bible Study and Prayer meetings. The Church regularly holds various group activities for children and parents as well as other ad-hoc activities for the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 18 February 2022: CIO registration
- 04 October 2023: Funds received from 233543 TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNEXION WITH TEDDINGTON B...
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alaine Meier | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kai Hung Lau | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Clifford | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANN WHITE | Trustee | 18 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Wilkinson | Trustee | 18 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £192.91k | £218.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.59k | £172.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Teddington Baptist Church
17 Church Road
TEDDINGTON
TW11 8PF
- Phone:
- 02089778000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window