CONGREGATION OF TOSH LONDON LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
as detailed in charity objects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Provides Services
- Hackney
Governance
- 01 October 2021: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joel Teller | Chair | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abraham Anthony Samuel Stern | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abraham Gratt | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £977.44k | £59.55k | £57.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.93k | £74.85k | £92.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £950.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £27.44k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.66k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £24.27k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £720 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £24.27k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 JUN 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ENGLISH LAW AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ESTABLISHING, SUPPORTING, MANAGING AND MAINTAINING A SYNAGOGUE FOR THE TOSH COMMUNITY IN NORTH LONDON AS A PLACE OF WORSHIP PUBLIC PRAYER AND RELIGIOUS STUDY AND BY PROVIDING FOR THE RELIGIOUS NEEDS, SPIRITUAL EDUCATION, PASTORAL NEEDS AND WELFARE OF ITS MEMBERS AND OF OTHER MEMBERS OF THE JEWISH COMMUNITY IN NORTH LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Fairholt Road
London
N16 5EN
- Phone:
- 07432732456
- Email:
- abrahamgratt@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window