IN2MEDSCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Widening participation organisation that provide free mentorship, resources and support for children across the UK aspiring to study Medicine and healthcare related degrees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
3500 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 February 2022: CIO registration
- IN2MEDSCHOOL COMMUNITY INTEREST COMPANY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Brian Wang MBBS PhD | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Lindsay | Trustee | 29 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robin Browne | Trustee | 29 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Tremellen | Trustee | 29 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Bull | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gabriela Anna Barzyk-Sheriff | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.68k | £15.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.73k | £14.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 16-18 WHO ARE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED, PRIMARILY THROUGH A) PROVIDING SUPPORT TO ASSIST YOUNG PEOPLE TO APPLY TO STUDY MEDICINE AND OTHER RELATED SUBJECTS AT UNIVERSITY; B) PROVIDING EVENTS, RESOURCES AND ADVICE TO SUPPORT YOUNG PEOPLE APPLYING FOR HIGHER EDUCATION; C) PROVIDING MENTORSHIP PROGRAMMES; D) PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO PURSUE HIGHER EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6D High Street
Wednesfield
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV11 1SZ
- Phone:
- 07920068530
- Email:
- admin@in2medschool.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window