HOPE VALLEY MEDICAL AIDS FUND

Charity Number: 518707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of the sick and disabled in the Hope Valley (Derbyshire) area by the provision of medical equipment , home nursing equipment and health education material and to provide equipment to enhance the life of disabled people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 April 1987: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANITA LOUISE CRITCHLOW Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £220 £16.78k £100 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 15 March 2025 258 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 15 March 2025 624 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 15 March 2025 989 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1419 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1419 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1784 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1784 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SHAW WOOD FARM
BARBER BOOTH
EDALE
HOPE VALLEY
S33 7ZL
Phone:
01433670271
Website:

No information available