THE CECCHETTI SOCIETY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objective is the advancement of the education of the public in the art of classical ballet and in particular that art as perpetrated by the Cecchetti Method to include the furtherance of the Cecchetti Method of training, the holding of classes or courses in classical ballet, organising conferences and seminars on teaching methods and the publication of educational literature on ballet.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- Germany
- Guernsey
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Italy
- Japan
- Jersey
- Malta
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Spain
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 09 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elisabeth Swan | Chair | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Janine Griffis | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Brill | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane van Schoor | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Catherine Hutchon | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Eileen McKendry-Gray | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Kristina Rogge | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Richard Denholm Thom | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £124.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £69.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 July 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 July 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF CLASSICAL BALLET AND IN PARTICULAR THAT ART AS PERPETRATED BY THE CECCHETTI METHOD OF TRAINING IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT INCLUDING BY: 3.1 THE FURTHERANCE OF THE CECCHETTI METHOD OF TRAINING; 3.2 HOLDING CLASSES OR COURSES IN CLASSICAL BALLET; 3.3 ORGANISING CONFERENCES AND SEMINARS ON TEACHING METHODS; 3.4 THE PUBLICATION OF EDUCATIONAL LITERATURE ON BALLET.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 PRYKES DRIVE
CHELMSFORD
CM1 1TP
- Phone:
- 01245267314
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window